There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to make permanent and expand the temporary minimum credit rate for the low-income housing tax credit program.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
12/14/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
12/14/2011Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/14/2011Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (90)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 12/14/2011
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 12/14/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 12/14/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 12/14/2011
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 12/14/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 12/14/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 12/14/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 12/14/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 12/20/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 12/20/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 01/24/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 02/17/2012
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 03/01/2012
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 03/01/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/20/2012
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/22/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/27/2012
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/18/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/18/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/18/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 04/18/2012
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 04/18/2012
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/18/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/18/2012
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 04/18/2012
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 04/19/2012
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/19/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/19/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/19/2012
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/27/2012
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/27/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 04/27/2012
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 04/27/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/27/2012
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/27/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 04/27/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/27/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/16/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/16/2012
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/16/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/16/2012
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 05/16/2012
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/16/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/16/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/18/2012
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/18/2012
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 06/07/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/07/2012
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 06/07/2012
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 06/07/2012
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 06/07/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/07/2012
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/07/2012
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 06/19/2012
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/19/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/19/2012
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/19/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/19/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/21/2012
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/21/2012
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 06/21/2012
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 07/10/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/10/2012
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 07/10/2012
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/12/2012
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 07/12/2012
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 07/12/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/24/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/24/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/24/2012
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 07/24/2012
Rep. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT-5] 08/01/2012
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 08/01/2012
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 08/01/2012
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 08/01/2012
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 08/01/2012
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 09/12/2012
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/12/2012
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 09/19/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/19/2012
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/19/2012
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 09/20/2012
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 10/09/2012
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 10/23/2012
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 10/23/2012
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 11/02/2012
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 12/18/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 12/18/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 12/18/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 12/18/2012

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Ways and Means12/14/2011 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3661. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (12/14/2011)

Amends the Internal Revenue Code to: (1) make permanent the low-income housing tax rate for new buildings that are not federally subsidized, and (2) establish a minimum 4% low-income tax credit rate for existing buildings that are not federally subsidized.