Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 12/14/2011
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 12/14/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 12/14/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 12/14/2011
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 12/14/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 12/14/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 12/14/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 12/14/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 12/20/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 12/20/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 01/24/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 02/17/2012
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 03/01/2012
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 03/01/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/20/2012
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/22/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/27/2012
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/18/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/18/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/18/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 04/18/2012
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 04/18/2012
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/18/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/18/2012
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 04/18/2012
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 04/19/2012
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/19/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/19/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/19/2012
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/27/2012
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/27/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 04/27/2012
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 04/27/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/27/2012
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/27/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 04/27/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/27/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/16/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/16/2012
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/16/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/16/2012
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 05/16/2012
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/16/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/16/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/18/2012
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/18/2012
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 06/07/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/07/2012
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 06/07/2012
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 06/07/2012
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 06/07/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/07/2012
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/07/2012
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 06/19/2012
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/19/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/19/2012
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/19/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/19/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/21/2012
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/21/2012
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 06/21/2012
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 07/10/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/10/2012
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 07/10/2012
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/12/2012
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 07/12/2012
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 07/12/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/24/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/24/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/24/2012
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 07/24/2012
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 08/01/2012
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 08/01/2012
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 08/01/2012
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 08/01/2012
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 08/01/2012
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 09/12/2012
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/12/2012
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 09/19/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/19/2012
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/19/2012
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 09/20/2012
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 10/09/2012
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 10/23/2012
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 10/23/2012
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 11/02/2012
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 12/18/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 12/18/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 12/18/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 12/18/2012