Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3]* 12/14/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 12/14/2011
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 12/14/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 12/14/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 12/14/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 12/14/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 12/14/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 12/14/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 12/14/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 12/14/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 12/14/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 12/14/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22]* 12/14/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 12/14/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 12/14/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 12/14/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 12/14/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 12/14/2011
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2]* 12/14/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 12/14/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 12/14/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 12/14/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 12/14/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 12/14/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 12/14/2011
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 01/18/2012
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 01/18/2012
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 01/18/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 01/18/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 01/18/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 01/18/2012
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 01/18/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/24/2012
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 01/24/2012
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 01/24/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 01/24/2012
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 01/24/2012
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 01/24/2012
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/01/2012
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 02/01/2012
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 02/01/2012
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 02/07/2012
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 02/07/2012
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 02/07/2012
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 02/07/2012
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 02/07/2012
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/07/2012
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/07/2012
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 02/09/2012
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/09/2012
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 02/09/2012
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 02/09/2012
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 02/09/2012
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 02/09/2012
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 02/16/2012
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 02/16/2012
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 02/16/2012
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/16/2012
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 02/21/2012
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 02/21/2012
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 02/24/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 03/06/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 03/06/2012
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 03/06/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 03/06/2012
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/08/2012
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 03/08/2012
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/08/2012
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 03/08/2012
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 03/08/2012
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 03/08/2012
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 04/16/2012
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 06/05/2012
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 06/05/2012