Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 12/14/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 12/14/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5]* 12/14/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/03/2012
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 02/07/2012
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 03/01/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 07/18/2012