Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 12/14/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 04/25/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/25/2012
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 04/27/2012
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 05/16/2012
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/16/2012
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 05/16/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 05/16/2012
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/16/2012
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/16/2012
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/16/2012
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/16/2012
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 05/16/2012
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 05/16/2012
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 05/16/2012
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 05/16/2012
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/16/2012
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 05/16/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/16/2012
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 05/16/2012
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 05/16/2012
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 05/16/2012
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 05/16/2012
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 05/16/2012
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 05/16/2012
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 05/16/2012
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 05/16/2012
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/31/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/01/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/05/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/05/2012
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 06/18/2012
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/18/2012