There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Transportation Security Administration to comply with the Uniformed Services Employment and Reemployment Rights Act.


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
08/16/2012Became Public Law No: 112-171. (TXT | PDF)
08/16/2012Signed by President.
08/07/2012Presented to President.
08/02/2012Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
08/02/2012Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6007)
05/30/2012Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H3239)
05/18/2012Reported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 112-487, Part I.
12/14/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (24)

Date Chamber All Actions
08/16/2012Became Public Law No: 112-171. (TXT | PDF)
08/16/2012Signed by President.
08/07/2012HousePresented to President.
08/03/2012SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/02/2012SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
08/02/2012SenateSenate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6007)
06/04/2012SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
05/30/2012-6:13pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/30/2012-6:13pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3239)
05/30/2012-5:59pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3670.
05/30/2012-5:59pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3239-3241)
05/30/2012-5:59pmHouseMr. King (NY) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
05/18/2012HouseReported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 112-487, Part I.
04/27/2012HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
04/27/2012HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
03/28/2012HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity
03/28/2012HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity
03/08/2012HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity
12/27/2011HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Transportation Security.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
12/23/2011HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
12/14/2011HouseReferred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
12/14/2011HouseReferred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
12/14/2011HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (22)


Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Homeland Security12/14/2011 Referred to
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Transportation Security12/27/2011 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs12/14/2011 Referred to
04/27/2012 Markup by
05/18/2012 Reported by H. Rept. 112-487
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity12/23/2011 Referred to
03/08/2012 Hearings by
03/28/2012 Markup by
03/28/2012 Reported by
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation06/04/2012 Referred to
08/02/2012 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.3670. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 112-171 (08/16/2012)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Amends the Aviation and Transportation Security Act to require the Transportation Security Administration (TSA) to comply with the Uniformed Services Employment and Reemployment Rights Act when carrying out certain personnel decisions with respect to the employment of air transportation passenger and property screeners.