Committees: H.R.3670 — 112th Congress (2011-2012)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Homeland Security12/14/2011 Referred to
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Transportation Security12/27/2011 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs12/14/2011 Referred to
04/27/2012 Markup by
05/18/2012 Reported by H. Rept. 112-487
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity12/23/2011 Referred to
03/08/2012 Hearings by
03/28/2012 Markup by
03/28/2012 Reported by
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation06/04/2012 Referred to
08/02/2012 Discharged from