Committees: H.R.3674 — 112th Congress (2011-2012)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Homeland Security12/15/2011 Referred to
04/18/2012 Markup by
07/11/2012 Reported by H. Rept. 112-592
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Security Technologies01/04/2012 Referred to
02/01/2012 Markup by
02/01/2012 Reported by
House Oversight and Government Reform12/15/2011 Referred to
07/11/2012 Discharged from
House Science, Space, and Technology12/15/2011 Referred to
07/11/2012 Discharged from
House Science, Space, and Technology Subcommittee on Technology and Innovation01/12/2012 Referred to
House Judiciary12/15/2011 Referred to
07/11/2012 Discharged from
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security01/06/2012 Referred to
House Intelligence (Permanent)12/15/2011 Referred to
07/11/2012 Discharged from
House Energy and Commerce07/11/2012 Referred to
09/21/2012 Discharged from