Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 12/15/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 12/15/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 12/15/2011
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9]* 12/15/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8]* 12/15/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 12/15/2011
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1]* 12/15/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 12/15/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 12/15/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 12/15/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 12/15/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 12/15/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 12/15/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 12/15/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 12/15/2011
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29]* 12/15/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 12/15/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13]* 12/15/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1]* 12/15/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 12/16/2011
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 12/16/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 12/16/2011
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 12/16/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 12/19/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 12/19/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 12/19/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 12/19/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 12/20/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 12/20/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 12/20/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 01/03/2012
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 01/10/2012
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 01/10/2012
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 01/10/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 01/17/2012
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 01/17/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 01/17/2012
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 01/17/2012
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 01/18/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/18/2012
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 01/18/2012
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 01/23/2012
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 01/23/2012
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 01/24/2012
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 01/27/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 01/31/2012
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 01/31/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/02/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/02/2012
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 02/02/2012
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/02/2012
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 02/03/2012
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 02/06/2012
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 02/06/2012
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 02/07/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/08/2012
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/08/2012
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 02/08/2012
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 02/14/2012
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 02/16/2012
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/27/2012
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 02/28/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/01/2012
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 03/05/2012
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 03/08/2012
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/29/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/16/2012
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/07/2012