Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 12/15/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 12/15/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 12/15/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/24/2012
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 01/24/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 01/24/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 01/24/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 01/24/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 08/02/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 08/02/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 08/02/2012
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/21/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/09/2012