Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 12/15/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 12/15/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 12/15/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 12/15/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 12/15/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 12/15/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 12/15/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 12/15/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 12/15/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 12/15/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 12/15/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 12/15/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 12/15/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 12/15/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 12/15/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17]* 12/15/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 12/15/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 12/15/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 01/23/2012
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 01/23/2012
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 01/23/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 01/23/2012
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 01/23/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/27/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/16/2012
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/16/2012
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/16/2012
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 04/16/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 04/16/2012
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/26/2012
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/26/2012
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/26/2012
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 04/26/2012
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/26/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/26/2012
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/09/2012
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/10/2012
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/16/2012
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 06/07/2012
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/21/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/21/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/18/2012
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/12/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 11/15/2012
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 11/15/2012