Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 12/15/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 01/18/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/25/2012
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 01/25/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 01/25/2012
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/20/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/29/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/15/2012
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/15/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/15/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/15/2012
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 08/07/2012
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 08/07/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 08/07/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 08/07/2012
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 08/07/2012
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 08/07/2012