Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 01/25/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 06/02/2011
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/20/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 12/16/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/29/2012