There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Due Process Guarantee Act of 2011

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To clarify that an authorization to use military force, a declaration of war, or any similar authority shall not authorize the detention without charge or trial of a citizen or lawful permanent resident of the United States and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
12/16/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
01/06/2012Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
12/16/2011Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/16/2011Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (64)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 12/16/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 12/16/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 12/16/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 12/16/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1]* 12/16/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 12/16/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 12/16/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 12/16/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 12/16/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 12/16/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 12/16/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36]* 12/16/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 12/16/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 12/20/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 12/20/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/20/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 12/20/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 12/20/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 12/20/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 12/20/2011
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 12/20/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 12/20/2011
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 12/20/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 12/20/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/20/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 12/20/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 12/20/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 12/20/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 12/23/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 01/06/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 01/06/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/06/2012
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 01/10/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 01/13/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/13/2012
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 01/13/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 01/13/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/13/2012
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 01/17/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 01/17/2012
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 01/19/2012
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 01/19/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/23/2012
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 01/23/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 01/23/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/23/2012
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 01/23/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 01/23/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 01/25/2012
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 01/31/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 01/31/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/31/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 01/31/2012
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 02/01/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/02/2012
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 02/02/2012
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/03/2012
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/06/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 02/07/2012
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/09/2012
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 02/09/2012
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 02/27/2012
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 03/19/2012
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 05/09/2012

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary12/16/2011 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security01/06/2012 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.