Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 12/16/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 12/16/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 12/16/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 12/16/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1]* 12/16/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 12/16/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 12/16/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 12/16/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 12/16/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 12/16/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 12/16/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36]* 12/16/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 12/16/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 12/20/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 12/20/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/20/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 12/20/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 12/20/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 12/20/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 12/20/2011
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 12/20/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 12/20/2011
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 12/20/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 12/20/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/20/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 12/20/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 12/20/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 12/20/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 12/23/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 01/06/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 01/06/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/06/2012
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 01/10/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 01/13/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/13/2012
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 01/13/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 01/13/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/13/2012
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 01/17/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 01/17/2012
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 01/19/2012
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 01/19/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/23/2012
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 01/23/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 01/23/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/23/2012
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 01/23/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 01/23/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 01/25/2012
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 01/31/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 01/31/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/31/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 01/31/2012
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 02/01/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/02/2012
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 02/02/2012
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/03/2012
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/06/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 02/07/2012
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/09/2012
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 02/09/2012
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 02/27/2012
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 03/19/2012
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 05/09/2012