Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 01/20/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 01/20/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 01/20/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 01/20/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 01/20/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 01/24/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 01/24/2011
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 01/26/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/14/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 02/14/2011
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 02/14/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 02/15/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 02/15/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 03/08/2011
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 03/29/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/29/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 05/03/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 05/26/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 07/13/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 07/13/2011
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/13/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 07/13/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/13/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/13/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/13/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/13/2011
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 07/13/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 07/13/2011
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 07/13/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 07/13/2011
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 07/13/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/13/2011
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 07/13/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 07/13/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 07/13/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 07/13/2011
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 07/13/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 07/13/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/13/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 07/13/2011
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 07/13/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 07/13/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 07/13/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 07/13/2011
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 07/13/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/13/2011
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 07/13/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/13/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/13/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 07/13/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 07/13/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 07/13/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 07/13/2011
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 07/13/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/13/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/13/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 07/13/2011
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 07/13/2011
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 07/13/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 07/13/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 07/13/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 07/19/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 07/19/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 07/19/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 07/19/2011
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 07/19/2011
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 07/25/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 07/25/2011
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 07/25/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 07/25/2011
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 07/25/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 07/25/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 07/25/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 07/25/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 07/25/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 07/25/2011
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/25/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/25/2011
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 07/25/2011
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 07/25/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 08/01/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 08/01/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 08/01/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 09/20/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 12/16/2011
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 06/21/2012
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 06/29/2012
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/18/2012