Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 12/16/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 12/16/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 02/03/2012
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/03/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/09/2012
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 02/09/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 02/17/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/17/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/17/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 04/17/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/10/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/20/2012