Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 12/16/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 12/16/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 12/20/2011
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 12/23/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/17/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 01/17/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 01/17/2012
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 01/18/2012
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 01/18/2012
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 01/24/2012
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 01/24/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 01/24/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 01/24/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 01/24/2012
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 01/24/2012
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 01/24/2012
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 01/24/2012
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 01/24/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/03/2012
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/03/2012
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 02/03/2012
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 02/03/2012
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 02/09/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/09/2012
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 02/09/2012
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 02/17/2012
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 02/17/2012
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 02/28/2012
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 02/28/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/28/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 02/28/2012
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 03/08/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 03/22/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/22/2012
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/22/2012
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 03/27/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/29/2012
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/29/2012
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/09/2012
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 05/09/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/09/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/09/2012
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/10/2012
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 07/10/2012
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/10/2012
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 08/02/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 08/03/2012
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/19/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/19/2012
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/19/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 09/19/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 09/19/2012
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 09/21/2012
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 09/21/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 11/15/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 12/04/2012
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 12/04/2012
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 12/04/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 12/11/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 12/11/2012