Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 12/19/2011
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/24/2012
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 04/24/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 04/24/2012
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 04/25/2012
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 04/25/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/31/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/21/2012
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/24/2012