Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 12/20/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 01/25/2012
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 02/09/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/28/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/28/2012
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 02/28/2012
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/28/2012
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 03/06/2012
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/29/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/16/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 04/16/2012
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 04/26/2012
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 05/29/2012