Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 12/23/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 12/23/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 01/10/2012
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 03/21/2012
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/18/2012
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 04/18/2012
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 05/09/2012