Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 12/23/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 12/23/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 12/23/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 12/23/2011
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 12/23/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 12/23/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 12/23/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 12/23/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 12/23/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 12/23/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 01/18/2012
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 01/31/2012
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 01/31/2012
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 01/31/2012
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 01/31/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/01/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/01/2012
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 02/01/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/01/2012
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 02/03/2012
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 02/03/2012
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 02/03/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 02/03/2012
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 02/06/2012
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 02/07/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/07/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 02/07/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/07/2012
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 02/08/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/08/2012
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/08/2012
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 02/08/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/13/2012
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/13/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 02/14/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/14/2012
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 02/14/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/16/2012
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 02/24/2012
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 02/24/2012
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 02/24/2012
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 02/24/2012
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 02/24/2012
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/24/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/27/2012
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 02/27/2012
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 02/28/2012
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/28/2012
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/05/2012
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 03/05/2012
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 03/05/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 03/06/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 03/06/2012
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/09/2012
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 03/09/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/09/2012
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 03/09/2012
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 03/09/2012
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/09/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/13/2012
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 03/13/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/13/2012
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/19/2012
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 03/20/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/20/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/21/2012
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/21/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/21/2012
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 03/22/2012
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 03/22/2012
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 03/26/2012
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 03/26/2012
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 03/26/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 03/26/2012
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/26/2012
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 03/26/2012
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 03/29/2012
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 03/29/2012
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 03/29/2012
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 04/19/2012
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/19/2012
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/19/2012
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/19/2012
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 04/25/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 05/17/2012
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/08/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/19/2012
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/19/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/20/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/20/2012
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 06/21/2012
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 06/27/2012
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 06/27/2012
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/09/2012
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 07/09/2012
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/11/2012
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 07/11/2012
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 07/18/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 08/01/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 08/01/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 08/01/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/21/2012