There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Executive Appointments Reform Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 5, United States Code, to provide that payment for services may not be made to an individual appointed during a recess of the Senate to fill a vacancy in an existing office, if the vacancy existed while the Senate was in session and was by law required to be filled by and with the advice and consent of the Senate, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/13/2012Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
03/29/2012Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
02/09/2012Referred to the Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
01/17/2012Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committees on Education and the Workforce, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/17/2012Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committees on Education and the Workforce, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/17/2012Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committees on Education and the Workforce, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/13/2012Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (58)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 01/13/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 01/13/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 01/13/2012
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 01/13/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/13/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 01/13/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 01/13/2012
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9]* 01/13/2012
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 01/13/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/13/2012
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 01/13/2012
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 01/13/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/13/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1]* 01/13/2012
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1]* 01/13/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 01/13/2012
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 01/13/2012
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 01/13/2012
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 01/13/2012
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 01/13/2012
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 01/13/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/17/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 01/17/2012
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 01/17/2012
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 01/17/2012
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 01/18/2012
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 01/18/2012
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 01/18/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 01/18/2012
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 01/18/2012
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 01/18/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 01/18/2012
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 01/18/2012
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 01/18/2012
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 01/18/2012
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 01/23/2012
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 01/23/2012
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 01/23/2012
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 01/23/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 01/23/2012
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 01/23/2012
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 01/23/2012
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 01/25/2012
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 01/27/2012
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 01/27/2012
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 01/27/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 01/31/2012
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 02/02/2012
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 02/02/2012
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/17/2012
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/27/2012
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 03/20/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/28/2012
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/29/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/17/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 04/25/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 05/07/2012
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 05/30/2012

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform01/17/2012 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce01/17/2012 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions03/29/2012 Referred to
House Financial Services01/17/2012 Referred to
House Financial Services Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit02/09/2012 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3770.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3770. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/13/2012)

Executive Appointments Reform Act - Eliminates exceptions to the prohibition against payment for services to an individual appointed to a federal position requiring confirmation by the U.S. Senate (advice and consent) during a recess of the Senate.

Prohibits any federal officer or employee serving in a position that requires Senate confirmation from providing voluntary or gratuitous services.

Amends the National Labor Relations Act to provide that a quorum required by the National Labor Relations Board to conduct its business shall not include any member of such Board who has not been confirmed by the Senate.

Amends the Dodd-Frank Wall Street Reform and Consumer Protection Act to: (1) provide that no rule, order, or other administrative action of the Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection shall be considered final if the Director of the Bureau was appointed during a recess of the Senate and the position of Director was vacant while the Senate was in session, until the Director has been confirmed by the Senate; (2) prohibit payment for services to any person appointed to the Bureau during a recess of the Senate to fill a vacancy in the Bureau requiring Senate confirmation, if the vacancy existed while the Senate was in session, until such appointee is confirmed by the Senate; and (3) prohibit an employee or officer of the Bureau serving in a position that requires Senate confirmation from providing voluntary or gratuitous services.