Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 01/13/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 01/13/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 01/13/2012
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 01/13/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/13/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 01/13/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 01/13/2012
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9]* 01/13/2012
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 01/13/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/13/2012
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 01/13/2012
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 01/13/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/13/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1]* 01/13/2012
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1]* 01/13/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 01/13/2012
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 01/13/2012
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 01/13/2012
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 01/13/2012
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 01/13/2012
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 01/13/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/17/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 01/17/2012
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 01/17/2012
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 01/17/2012
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 01/18/2012
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 01/18/2012
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 01/18/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 01/18/2012
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 01/18/2012
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 01/18/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 01/18/2012
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 01/18/2012
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 01/18/2012
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 01/18/2012
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 01/23/2012
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 01/23/2012
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 01/23/2012
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 01/23/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 01/23/2012
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 01/23/2012
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 01/23/2012
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 01/25/2012
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 01/27/2012
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 01/27/2012
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 01/27/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 01/31/2012
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 02/02/2012
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 02/02/2012
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/17/2012
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/27/2012
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 03/20/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/28/2012
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/29/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/17/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 04/25/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 05/07/2012
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 05/30/2012