Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 01/13/2012
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 01/13/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 01/13/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 01/13/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/13/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 01/13/2012
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/13/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/13/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 01/13/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/13/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/24/2012
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 01/24/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 01/31/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 01/31/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/02/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/27/2012