Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 01/23/2012
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 01/23/2012
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 01/23/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 01/23/2012
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 01/23/2012
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 01/23/2012
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 01/23/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 01/24/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 01/24/2012
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 01/25/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 01/25/2012
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 01/31/2012
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 01/31/2012
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 01/31/2012
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 02/01/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/01/2012
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/02/2012
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 02/02/2012