Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 01/23/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/24/2012
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 01/27/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/15/2012
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 03/01/2012
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 05/08/2012
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 05/16/2012