Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/24/2012
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 05/29/2012
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/05/2012
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 06/15/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/28/2012
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/28/2012