There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Egg Products Inspection Act Amendments of 2012

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for a uniform national standard for the housing and treatment of egg-laying hens, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/23/2012Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
02/08/2012Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock, Dairy, and Poultry.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
01/23/2012Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/23/2012Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (153)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 01/31/2012
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/07/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/08/2012
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/08/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/13/2012
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 02/13/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/15/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/15/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 02/15/2012
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 02/17/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 02/17/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 02/17/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/29/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/29/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/29/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/29/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/29/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/29/2012
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 02/29/2012
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/29/2012
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 02/29/2012
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/06/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/06/2012
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/06/2012
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 03/06/2012
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/06/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 03/08/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/08/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 03/08/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/08/2012
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 03/08/2012
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/08/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/08/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/08/2012
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/08/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/08/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/08/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/08/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/08/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/21/2012
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/21/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/21/2012
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/22/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/22/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/22/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/22/2012
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 03/22/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/22/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/28/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 04/24/2012
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/24/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/24/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/24/2012
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 05/09/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/09/2012
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/10/2012
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/15/2012
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/15/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 05/17/2012
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 05/17/2012
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 05/18/2012
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/31/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/05/2012
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/08/2012
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/08/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/18/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/18/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/18/2012
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 06/18/2012
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 06/18/2012
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/18/2012
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 06/18/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/18/2012
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/18/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/18/2012
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 06/18/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/19/2012
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 06/19/2012
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/19/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 06/20/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/21/2012
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/21/2012
Rep. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT-5] 06/21/2012
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/21/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/21/2012
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/27/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/27/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/27/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 06/28/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 06/28/2012
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/28/2012
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/28/2012
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/28/2012
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/29/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/29/2012
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/29/2012
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/09/2012
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/09/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/09/2012
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/11/2012
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 07/11/2012
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 07/11/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/11/2012
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 07/11/2012
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 07/17/2012
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/17/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/17/2012
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 07/18/2012
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/19/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/23/2012
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 07/23/2012
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 07/23/2012
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/24/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/26/2012
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/26/2012
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 07/26/2012
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 07/30/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/30/2012
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 07/31/2012
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/31/2012
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/31/2012
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 08/01/2012
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 08/01/2012
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 08/02/2012
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 08/02/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 08/02/2012
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 08/02/2012
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 08/02/2012
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 08/02/2012
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 08/02/2012
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 08/02/2012
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 08/02/2012
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 08/02/2012
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 08/02/2012
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 08/07/2012
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 08/07/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 09/10/2012
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 09/10/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/10/2012
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/10/2012
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/14/2012
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/14/2012
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 09/14/2012
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/14/2012
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 09/14/2012
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/19/2012
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/19/2012
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 09/21/2012
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 11/27/2012
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 12/05/2012
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 02/08/2012 07/09/2012 --

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture01/23/2012 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Livestock, Dairy, and Poultry02/08/2012 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3798. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/23/2012)

Egg Products Inspection Act Amendments of 2012 - Amends the Egg Products Inspection Act to revise housing and treatment of egg-laying hens and related enforcement provisions.

Directs the Secretary of Agriculture (USDA) to delegate to the California Department of Food and Agriculture certain enforcement authority with respect to eggs produced, shipped, handled, transported or received in California prior to the date that is 18 years after the date of enactment of this Act.