Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 01/06/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 01/06/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 01/06/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 01/06/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 01/06/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 01/06/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 01/06/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 01/06/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 01/06/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 01/06/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 01/06/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 01/06/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 01/07/2011
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 01/07/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 01/18/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 01/18/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 01/18/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/18/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 01/18/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 01/18/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 01/18/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 01/25/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 01/25/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 01/25/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 01/25/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 01/25/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 01/25/2011
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 02/08/2011
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 02/08/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 02/08/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 02/08/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/08/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 02/17/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/17/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 03/08/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 05/11/2011