Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 01/23/2012
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 01/23/2012
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 01/25/2012
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 01/25/2012
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 01/25/2012
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 01/27/2012
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 02/01/2012
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 02/01/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 02/01/2012
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 02/01/2012
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/01/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/01/2012
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 02/02/2012
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 02/02/2012
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 02/03/2012
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 02/03/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 02/07/2012
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/14/2012
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 02/16/2012
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 02/16/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 02/27/2012
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 02/29/2012
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 03/27/2012
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 07/24/2012