Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 02/01/2012
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 02/15/2012
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 02/16/2012
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 02/16/2012
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 02/16/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 02/29/2012
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/05/2012
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/07/2012
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/26/2012