Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 01/23/2012
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 02/15/2012
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 02/21/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/07/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/19/2012
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/16/2012
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 04/18/2012
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/19/2012
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 05/07/2012
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/08/2012
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/28/2012
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 11/27/2012