Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 01/24/2012
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 01/24/2012
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 01/24/2012
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 01/24/2012
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 01/24/2012
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 01/24/2012
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 01/24/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 01/24/2012
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 01/24/2012
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 01/24/2012
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 01/24/2012
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 01/27/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 01/27/2012
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 01/27/2012
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 01/27/2012
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 01/27/2012
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 01/27/2012
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 01/27/2012
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 01/27/2012
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 01/27/2012
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 01/27/2012
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 01/27/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 01/27/2012
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 01/27/2012
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 01/27/2012
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 01/27/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 01/27/2012
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 01/27/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 01/27/2012
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 01/27/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 01/27/2012
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 01/27/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 01/31/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 01/31/2012
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 01/31/2012
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 01/31/2012
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 01/31/2012
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/01/2012
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 02/01/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 02/01/2012
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 02/01/2012
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 02/01/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/01/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/01/2012
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 02/01/2012
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 02/01/2012
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 02/01/2012
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 02/01/2012
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 02/01/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/01/2012
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 02/01/2012
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 02/01/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 02/02/2012
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 02/02/2012
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 02/02/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/03/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 02/03/2012
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 02/03/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 02/03/2012
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/03/2012
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 02/03/2012
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/06/2012
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 02/06/2012
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 02/06/2012
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 02/06/2012
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 02/07/2012
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 02/08/2012
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 02/08/2012
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 02/08/2012
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 02/14/2012
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 02/16/2012
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/24/2012
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 03/06/2012
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 05/10/2012
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 05/30/2012