There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Securing Annuities for Federal Employees Act of 2012

Short Titles as Introduced

Securing Annuities for Federal Employees Act of 2012

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 5, United States Code, to secure the annuities of Federal civilian employees, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
02/09/2012Committee on House Administration discharged.
02/09/2012Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 112-394, Part I.
01/24/2012Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date
02/14/2012-11:32pmRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 547 Reported to House. The resolution provides for one hour of debate on H.R. 3408. All points of order against consideration of the bill are waived. Specified amendments printed in part A of the report accompanying this resolution are in order. The resolution provides for one hour of debate on H.R. 3813. All points of order against consideration of the bill are waived. Specified amendments printed in part B of the report accompanying this resolution are in order. The resolution provides for one hour of debate on H.R. 7.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/09/2012Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 274.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/09/2012Committee on House Administration discharged.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/09/2012Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 112-394, Part I.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
02/07/2012Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 16.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
02/07/2012Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
01/24/2012Referred to House Administration
Action By: House of Representatives
01/24/2012Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
Action By: House of Representatives
01/24/2012Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/24/2012Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform01/24/2012 Referred to
02/07/2012 Markup by
02/09/2012 Reported by H. Rept. 112-394
House Administration01/24/2012 Referred to
02/09/2012 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3813. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House amended, Part I (02/09/2012)

Securing Annuities for Federal Employees Act of 2012 - Increases the employee contribution to the Civil Service Retirement System (CSRS) and to the Federal Employees Retirement System (FERS) by .5% of salary in each of calendar years 2013, 2014, and 2015. Reduces the employer contribution to CSRS and FERS by the amount of the increased employee contribution.

Establishes new annuity computation rules for federal employees and Members of Congress who begin service after December 31, 2012, and who have less than five years of civilian service creditable under CSRS or any other retirement system for federal employees (secure annuity employees). Increases the employee contribution for secure annuity employees and calculates annuities for such employees based upon the average of their highest five years of salary (for current federal employees, the calculation is based on the highest three years of salary).

Eliminates the FERS annuity supplement for employees not subject to mandatory retirement who separate from service after December 31, 2012.

Allows federal employees, including employees of the U.S. Postal Service (USPS) and the Postal Regulatory Commission (PRC), and Members of Congress, to contribute payments received for accumulated and accrued annual or vacation leave to the Thrift Savings Fund.