Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 01/24/2012
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 02/07/2012
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 02/07/2012
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 03/19/2012
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/25/2012
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 04/25/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 06/20/2012
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 06/20/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 06/20/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/26/2012
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 06/27/2012
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 07/17/2012
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/19/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/23/2012