Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 01/24/2012
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 01/24/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 01/31/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 01/31/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/02/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/02/2012
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/02/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/06/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/27/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/27/2012
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/21/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/27/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/17/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/09/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/11/2012
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 11/13/2012