Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/07/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/07/2012
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 02/07/2012
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/15/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/15/2012
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 02/15/2012
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/27/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/27/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/16/2012
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/21/2012