Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9]* 01/25/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 01/25/2012
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 01/25/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 01/25/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 01/25/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 01/25/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13]* 01/25/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/25/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/25/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 01/31/2012
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 01/31/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 01/31/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 01/31/2012
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 01/31/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 01/31/2012
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 01/31/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 01/31/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/31/2012
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 01/31/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 01/31/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 01/31/2012
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 01/31/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 01/31/2012
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 01/31/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 01/31/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 01/31/2012
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 01/31/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 01/31/2012
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 01/31/2012
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 01/31/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 01/31/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 01/31/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 01/31/2012
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 01/31/2012
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/31/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 01/31/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 01/31/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/31/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 01/31/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/31/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 01/31/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/02/2012
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 02/02/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/02/2012
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/02/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/02/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 02/02/2012
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 02/02/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/02/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/03/2012
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 02/03/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/03/2012
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 02/03/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/08/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/08/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 02/08/2012
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/08/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/15/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/15/2012
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 02/15/2012
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 02/15/2012
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/15/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 02/15/2012
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 02/15/2012
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 02/16/2012
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 02/16/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/16/2012
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 02/17/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/17/2012
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 02/17/2012
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 02/28/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/28/2012
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 02/28/2012
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/28/2012
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 02/28/2012
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/28/2012
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 02/28/2012
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 02/28/2012
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 02/28/2012
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/29/2012
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 02/29/2012
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/06/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/06/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/21/2012
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/21/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/21/2012
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/22/2012
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 03/22/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/26/2012
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/26/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/26/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/26/2012
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 03/27/2012
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 03/27/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/27/2012
Rep. Hochul, Kathleen C. [D-NY-26] 03/27/2012
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/27/2012
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 03/28/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 03/28/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/28/2012
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 03/28/2012
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 03/28/2012
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 03/28/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/29/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/29/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/29/2012
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/29/2012
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/29/2012
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/29/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 04/16/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/16/2012
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/16/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/16/2012
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/16/2012
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 04/16/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/16/2012
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 04/16/2012
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/17/2012
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 04/17/2012
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/17/2012
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 04/18/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/19/2012
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/19/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 04/19/2012
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/19/2012
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 04/19/2012
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 04/24/2012
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 04/24/2012
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/24/2012
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/24/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/24/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 04/24/2012
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 04/24/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 04/24/2012
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/24/2012
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/24/2012
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 04/24/2012
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/24/2012
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/24/2012
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 04/24/2012
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 04/24/2012
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 04/24/2012
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/24/2012
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/24/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/24/2012
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 04/25/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/25/2012
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 04/25/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/25/2012
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/25/2012
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 04/26/2012
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/26/2012
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/26/2012
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/21/2012