Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 01/25/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 01/25/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 01/25/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23]* 01/25/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 01/25/2012
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 01/25/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 01/25/2012
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 01/25/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/25/2012
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 01/25/2012
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 01/31/2012
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 01/31/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 01/31/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 01/31/2012
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 01/31/2012
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 02/01/2012
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 02/01/2012
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 02/01/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/01/2012
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 02/01/2012
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 02/01/2012
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 02/01/2012
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 02/01/2012
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 02/02/2012
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 02/02/2012
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 02/03/2012
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 02/06/2012
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/06/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 02/08/2012
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 02/09/2012
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 02/14/2012
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 02/14/2012
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/15/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 02/15/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 02/15/2012
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 02/16/2012
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 02/27/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/01/2012
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/22/2012
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/22/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/28/2012
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 03/28/2012
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 03/29/2012
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 04/16/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/16/2012
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 04/25/2012
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/25/2012
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 04/26/2012
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 05/07/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 05/08/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 07/26/2012