Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 01/31/2012
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 02/08/2012
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 02/09/2012
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/01/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/07/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 03/07/2012
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 03/07/2012
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 03/07/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/07/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/08/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/13/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/16/2012
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/16/2012
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/19/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/21/2012
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/26/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 03/28/2012
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-8] 03/28/2012
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/28/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/29/2012
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/16/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/16/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 04/16/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/18/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/19/2012
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/23/2012
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/25/2012
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/27/2012
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/07/2012
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 05/07/2012
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 05/07/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/10/2012
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/10/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/16/2012
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 05/16/2012
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/25/2012
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 05/31/2012
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 05/31/2012
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 06/05/2012
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/05/2012
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/15/2012
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/21/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 12/18/2012