Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 02/02/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 02/07/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 02/07/2012
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 02/28/2012
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 02/28/2012
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 02/28/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 02/28/2012
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/28/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/28/2012
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/28/2012
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 02/28/2012
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/18/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/18/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/18/2012
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/18/2012
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 04/18/2012
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 04/24/2012
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 04/24/2012
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 04/24/2012
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 04/24/2012
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 04/24/2012
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/24/2012
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 04/24/2012
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 04/26/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/26/2012
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 04/26/2012
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/26/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 04/27/2012
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 05/08/2012
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 05/08/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 05/08/2012
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 05/30/2012
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/30/2012
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 05/30/2012