Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 01/31/2012
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 01/31/2012
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 02/28/2012
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/28/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 02/29/2012
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 02/29/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/29/2012
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 03/05/2012
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 03/06/2012
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/19/2012
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 03/19/2012
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 03/21/2012
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/21/2012
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 03/21/2012
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/22/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/26/2012
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 03/26/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/26/2012
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/26/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 03/26/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/26/2012
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 03/29/2012
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 04/16/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/16/2012
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 04/16/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 04/19/2012
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 04/19/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/19/2012
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/27/2012
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/08/2012
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/16/2012
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 05/16/2012
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 05/31/2012
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/06/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 06/18/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/18/2012
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 06/18/2012
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 06/18/2012
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 07/19/2012
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 07/24/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 08/01/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/19/2012
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 10/23/2012