Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/31/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 01/31/2012
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 01/31/2012
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21]* 01/31/2012
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10]* 01/31/2012
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13]* 01/31/2012
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11]* 01/31/2012
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25]* 01/31/2012
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 01/31/2012
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 01/31/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 01/31/2012
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 01/31/2012
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 01/31/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/31/2012
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 01/31/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/01/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 02/01/2012
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/01/2012
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/02/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 02/06/2012
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 02/08/2012
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 02/09/2012
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 02/09/2012
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 02/14/2012
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 02/15/2012
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/27/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/27/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/27/2012
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 02/29/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/29/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 02/29/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/05/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 03/05/2012
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/07/2012
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/09/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/28/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 04/16/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/16/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/16/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/16/2012
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/10/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/10/2012
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 12/31/2012