Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 01/31/2012
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25]* 01/31/2012
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22]* 01/31/2012
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24]* 01/31/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/31/2012
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 01/31/2012
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 01/31/2012
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-8]* 01/31/2012
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 02/07/2012
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 02/07/2012
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 02/14/2012
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 03/05/2012
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 05/10/2012