There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Sunshine for Regulatory Decrees and Settlements Act of 2012

Short Titles as Introduced

Sunshine for Regulatory Decrees and Settlements Act of 2012

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To impose certain limitations on consent decrees and settlement agreements by agencies that require the agencies to take regulatory action in accordance with the terms thereof, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
07/11/2012Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 112-593.
02/01/2012Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date
07/11/2012Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 428.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/11/2012Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 112-593.
03/27/2012Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 20 - 10.
03/27/2012Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
03/20/2012Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
03/15/2012Subcommittee on Courts, Commercial and Administrative Law Discharged.
02/03/2012Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Courts, Commercial and Administrative Law
02/02/2012Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Commercial and Administrative Law.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/01/2012Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/01/2012Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary02/01/2012 Referred to
03/27/2012 Markup by
07/11/2012 Reported by H. Rept. 112-593
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Courts, Commercial and Administrative Law02/02/2012 Referred to
02/03/2012 Hearings by
03/15/2012 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3862. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House with amendment(s) (07/11/2012)

Sunshine for Regulatory Decrees and Settlements Act of 2012 - (Sec. 2) States that the provisions of this Act shall apply to: (1) a consent decree or settlement agreement in an action to compel agency action alleged to be unlawfully withheld or unreasonably delayed that pertains to a regulatory action that affects the rights of private parties other than the plaintiff or the rights of state, local, or tribal governments brought under judicial review provisions of the U.S. Code or under any other statute authorizing such an action; and (2) any other consent decree or settlement agreement that requires agency action that pertains to a regulatory action that affects the rights of private parties other than the plaintiff or the rights of state, local, or tribal governments.

Sets forth requirements with respect to actions to be resolved by a consent decree or settlement agreement under this Act, including requiring: (1) publication in a readily accessible manner (including electronically) of the complaint, the consent decree or settlement agreement, the statutory basis for the decree or agreement and its terms, and any award of attorneys' fees or costs; (2) an opportunity for affected parties to intervene in an action prior to the entry of a consent decree or settlement agreement; (3) referral to a mediation or alternative dispute resolution program after a motion to intervene is granted; (4) an opportunity for public comment on a proposed consent decree or settlement agreement before it is filed with a court; and (5) approval by the Attorney General of any proposed consent decree or settlement agreement in cases litigated by the Department of Justice (DOJ).

Requires each agency to submit an annual report to Congress on the number, identity, and content of complaints, consent decrees, and settlement agreements for that year, including the statutory basis for each decree or agreement and its terms, and any awards of attorneys fees or costs in actions resolved by decrees or agreements.

(Sec. 3) Requires a court to grant de novo review to any motion filed by an agency to modify a previously-entered consent decree if the basis of such motion is that the terms of the decree are no longer fully in the public interest due to the agency's obligations to fulfill other duties or due to changed facts and circumstances.

(Sec. 4) Makes the provisions of this Act applicable to any covered consent decree or settlement agreement proposed to a court after the enactment of this Act.