Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/08/2012
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 02/08/2012
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 02/15/2012
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 02/27/2012
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 02/29/2012
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/06/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/26/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/27/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/08/2012
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 05/10/2012
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/15/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/30/2012