There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To award a Congressional Gold Medal in honor of the pioneers and participants of the Civil Rights movement.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/01/2012Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
02/09/2012Referred to the Subcommittee on Domestic Monetary Policy and Technology.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
02/03/2012Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H464)
Action By: House of Representatives
02/01/2012Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/01/2012Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/01/2012Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (63)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 02/01/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 02/07/2012
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 02/07/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/07/2012
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 02/07/2012
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 02/07/2012
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/07/2012
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/07/2012
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/07/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/07/2012
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 02/07/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/07/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/07/2012
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 02/16/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/16/2012
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 02/16/2012
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/28/2012
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/26/2012

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services02/01/2012 Referred to
House Financial Services Subcommittee on Domestic Monetary Policy and Technology02/09/2012 Referred to
House Administration02/01/2012 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3866.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3866. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/01/2012)

Requires the Speaker of the House of Representatives and the President pro tempore of the Senate to make arrangements for the award of a Congressional Gold Medal to collectively honor the pioneers and participants of the civil rights movement in recognition of their personal sacrifice and service to their country. Directs that the Medal be given to the Smithsonian Institution, where it shall be displayed.

Expresses the sense of Congress that the Smithsonian should make the Medal available for display elsewhere, particularly at other locations associated with the civil rights movement.