Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 02/01/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 02/07/2012
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 02/07/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/07/2012
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 02/07/2012
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 02/07/2012
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/07/2012
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/07/2012
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/07/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/07/2012
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 02/07/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/07/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/07/2012
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 02/16/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/16/2012
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 02/16/2012
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/28/2012
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/26/2012