Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 02/01/2012
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 02/01/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 02/02/2012
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 02/02/2012
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 02/03/2012
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 02/03/2012
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 02/03/2012
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 02/06/2012
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 02/08/2012
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 02/08/2012
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 02/08/2012
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 02/08/2012
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 02/08/2012
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 02/08/2012
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 02/15/2012
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 02/15/2012
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 02/15/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 02/15/2012
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 02/15/2012
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/19/2012
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 06/05/2012